Trustees CORN EXCHANGE THEATRE COMPANY
Charity number: 1092736

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER BRADSHAW | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JON DEARDEN | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Beech | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Paige | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Duffy | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brendan McGaritty | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda Ann Mills | Trustee | 10 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Smith | Trustee | 21 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER CHAPPELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL MASSINGHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID THURSTON SIMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HARRISH Bisnauthsing | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.