Financial history RICHARD OVERALL TRUST

Charity number: 1088640
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £10.90k £8.48k £7.44k £2.64k £5.77k
Total expenditure £17.82k £22.57k £12.80k £2.05k £1.35k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A