Financial history THE ASTOR COLLEGE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1088689
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £5 £10 £13 £2 £8
Total expenditure £25 £16 £16 £8 £36
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A