Accounts and annual returns MENTER Y MOELWYN

Charity number: 1088455
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 02 June 2009 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 19 December 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 11 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 05 March 2007 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 26 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 20 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 20 January 2006 On Time