Financial history MENTER Y MOELWYN

Charity number: 1088455
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £5.04k £32.45k £14.04k £4.30k £258
Total expenditure £6.52k £30.12k £14.63k £919 £2.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A