Accounts and annual returns KIRKHAM INTEGRATED STROKE SUPPORT (KISS)
Charity Number: 1089353
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2012 | 30 August 2013 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2011 | 09 February 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2011 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window