Financial history KIRKHAM INTEGRATED STROKE SUPPORT (KISS)

Charity number: 1089353
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2008 30/06/2009 30/06/2010 30/06/2011 30/06/2012
Total gross income £2.08k £2.15k £665 £1.67k £13.85k
Total expenditure £1.67k £5.05k £61 £696 £302
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A