Accounts and annual returns WALSALL CITY ACADEMY TRUST

Charity number: 1088553
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2010 24 March 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 24 March 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2009 29 March 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 29 March 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2008 15 April 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 13 March 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2007 14 February 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 14 February 2008 On Time