Financial history WALSALL CITY ACADEMY TRUST

Charity number: 1088553
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2006 31/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010
Total gross income £4.65m £5.09m £6.19m £6.76m £6.81m
Total expenditure £5.16m £5.79m £6.14m £6.83m £7.19m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £4.75m £5.83m £6.41m £6.47m
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £41.87k £61.89k £19.06k £2.19k
Income - Other N/A £290.10k £304.76k £335.52k £338.17k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £5.46m £5.80m £6.45m £6.82m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £41.45k £37.67k £41.29k £35.68k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £292.65k £308.51k £340.25k £335.73k