Accounts and annual returns JUMPING THROUGH HOOPS LIMITED

Charity Number: 1092621
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 28 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 01 July 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 22 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 22 December 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 02 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 10 December 2013 On Time