Accounts and annual returns MENINGITIS HELP

Charity number: 1090505
Charity reporting is overdue by 680 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 314 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 314 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 680 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 01 November 2024 490 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 July 2022 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 August 2021 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 16 July 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 16 July 2020 16 days late Download Open in new window