Financial history ALLIANCE LEARNING

Charity Number: 1095067
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019
Total gross income £2.70m £2.83m £2.96m £2.79m £2.95m
Total expenditure £2.65m £3.00m £3.09m £2.94m £2.92m
Income from government contracts £1.72m £1.67m £1.62m £1.51m £1.47m
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.70m £2.83m £1.62m £1.91m £1.89m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £21.82k £1.38k £2.68k £3.35k £1.76k
Income - Other £0 £5.91k £1.34m £875.72k £1.06m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.65m £3.00m £3.10m £2.94m £2.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £10.30k £10.60k £16.10k £12.53k £13.51k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £895.62k