Governing document ALLIANCE LEARNING
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3/3/1982 AMENDED BY RESOLUTION OF 21/9/1988, CERT OF CHANGE OF NAME 4/11/1988, RESOLUTION OF 30/7/2001, CERT CHANGE OF NAME 11/10/ 2001, RESOLUTION DATED 23/10/ 2002, AS AMENDED ON 26/1/2004 as amended on 16 May 2018 as amended on 30 Mar 2011 as amended on 29 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE THEORETICAL AND PRACTICAL EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS, ENGAGED OR INTENDING TO BE ENGAGED IN INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE; SUBJECT TO THE FOREGOING OBJECT, TO EXTEND SUCH PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE TO THE TRAINING OR EDUCATION OF MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.