Accounts and annual returns THE HARMONY HEALING GROUP

Charity Number: 1093794
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 07 March 2012 24 August 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 11 March 2011 01 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 11 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 11 March 2010 15 June 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 11 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 04 March 2009 11 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 March 2009 Not Required