Financial history THE HARMONY HEALING GROUP

Charity Number: 1093794
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/03/2008 04/03/2009 11/03/2010 11/03/2011 07/03/2012
Total gross income £2.53k £2.60k £2.24k £1.96k £1.87k
Total expenditure £2.04k £1.96k £1.75k £1.65k £1.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A