Accounts and annual returns ABBOTSWOOD PTA

Charity number: 1091999
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 22 February 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 06 July 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2015 06 July 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2014 08 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2014 Not Required