Financial history ABBOTSWOOD PTA

Charity number: 1091999
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2013 31/10/2014 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017
Total gross income £3.28k £6.20k £7.23k £4.02k £4.07k
Total expenditure £4.41k £5.50k £6.53k £6.45k £2.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A