Accounts and annual returns THE ASSOCIATION OF CHAUNCY FRIENDS

Charity number: 1094609
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2010 31 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2009 08 February 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2008 16 March 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 Not Required