Accounts and annual returns YOUTH SPORTS UK

Charity number: 1092290
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 04 April 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 04 April 2012 22 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2012 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2011 Not submitted