Financial history YOUTH SPORTS UK

Charity number: 1092290
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2006 04/04/2007 04/04/2008 04/04/2009 04/04/2012
Total gross income £4.14k £2.89k £2.00k £0 £0
Total expenditure £6.21k £2.89k £1.90k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A