Accounts and annual returns LEWIS WARD TRUST

Charity number: 1100891
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 05 September 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 October 2017 On Time