Financial history LEWIS WARD TRUST

Charity number: 1100891
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £10.63k £71 £25.06k £20.02k £20.03k
Total expenditure £3.65k £1.12k £44.28k £90 £43.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A