Financial history FARNHAM REP LTD

Charity Number: 1093817
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £1.02k £3.54k £2 £625 £1.15k
Total expenditure £4.00k £359 £1.02k £608 £2.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A