Governing document FARNHAM REP LTD
Charity number: 1093817

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 APRIL 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 4 SEPTEMBER 2002 AND 30 APRIL 2007 AND CERTIFICATES OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11 MAY 2006 AND 18 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN FARNHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE DRAMATIC ARTS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
SURREY - FARNHAM
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.