Accounts and annual returns VICTIM SUPPORT SOUTH WALES

Charity Number: 1095397
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 06 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 06 August 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 24 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 24 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 29 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 27 October 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 16 November 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 23 March 2005 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 31 January 2005 On Time