Financial history VICTIM SUPPORT SOUTH WALES

Charity number: 1095397
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £693.39k £773.66k £876.72k £891.16k £740.00k
Total expenditure £357.84k £717.37k £953.88k £922.18k £765.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £835.35k £685.18k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £640 £2.81k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £1.98k £4.46k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £53.19k £47.54k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £884.52k £729.62k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £11.22k £11.09k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £44 £0