Financial history GREENFIELDS JUNIOR SCHOOL PTFA

Charity Number: 1093055
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £8.77k £9.81k £9.01k £3.55k £0
Total expenditure £7.92k £5.42k £3.35k £7.47k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A