Financial history BRITISH SOCIETY OF ECHOCARDIOGRAPHY

Charity number: 1093808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £923.03k £926.76k £944.64k £1.21m £1.36m
Total expenditure £992.83k £781.78k £870.21k £1.14m £1.36m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £16.92k
Income - Donations and legacies £13.25k £17.13k £793 £747 £300
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £908.40k £862.03k £943.85k £1.19m £1.34m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £26 £47.60k £0 £144 £17.68k
Income - Other £1.36k £0 £0 £12.56k £2.26k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £978.17k £781.78k £870.21k £1.14m £1.35m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £6.52k
Expenditure - Governance £13.23k £1.36k £21.83k £11.05k £16.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £10.00k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £6.52k
Expenditure - Other £14.66k £0 £0 £0 £0