Governing document LEE VALLEY HOUSING ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 MAY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 19 AUGUST 2002, 27 NOVEMBER 2002, 09 JANUARY 2003 AND 13 NOVEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
A. PROVIDING HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; B. PROVIDING FOR AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED (WHETHER MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; C. PROVIDING SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS TO AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED (WHETHER MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF AND PROVIDING ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS. D. THE PROVISION OF RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREA IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK. E. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST THE RESIDENTS OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREA IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK. F. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE. G. THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE INTERESTS OF REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.