Accounts and annual returns CHRIST PARADISE CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1095008
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 13 August 2024 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 13 August 2024 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 31 July 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 31 July 2023 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 16 August 2022 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 16 August 2022 17 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 31 July 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 31 July 2021 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 31 July 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 31 July 2020 1 days late Download Open in new window