Financial history CHRIST PARADISE CHURCH TRUST

Charity Number: 1095008
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £63.37k £51.28k £67.98k £118.12k £113.94k
Total expenditure £64.71k £50.86k £66.30k £99.31k £110.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A