Accounts and annual returns PLAY RAFFLES

Charity number: 1095084
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 10 December 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 14 January 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 19 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 31 July 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 06 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 24 July 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 24 September 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 24 September 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 19 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 19 September 2006 On Time