Financial history PLAY RAFFLES

Charity number: 1095084
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £66.37k £56.56k £70.81k £74.19k £51.95k
Total expenditure £55.41k £56.91k £82.60k £77.80k £54.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A