Accounts and annual returns FULL GOSPEL REVIVAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1099321
Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 February 2023 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 24 February 2023 24 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 November 2022 288 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 November 2022 288 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 May 2021 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 May 2021 99 days late Download Open in new window