Financial history FLOURISH HOMES LIMITED

Charity number: 1096689
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £15.70m £15.68m £17.16m £18.74m £19.62m
Total expenditure £17.42m £16.57m £16.19m £19.01m £19.71m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £164.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £15.67m £17.12m £18.72m £19.62m
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £7.00k £40.00k £14.00k £3.00k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £15.68m £0 £0 £18.70m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £895.00k £1.15m £1.06m £1.00m
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £15.04m £17.95m £0