Accounts and annual returns ASSEMBLEIA DE DEUS DE LONDRES

Charity number: 1096551
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2009 30 March 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2009 23 March 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 May 2008 30 March 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2008 23 March 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 May 2007 30 July 2008 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2007 30 July 2008 121 days late
Annual return 31 May 2006 29 May 2007 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2006 29 May 2007 59 days late
Annual return 31 May 2005 30 May 2007 425 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2005 30 May 2007 425 days late