Accounts and annual returns CHILDER THORNTON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1095975
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2015 11 April 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2014 02 June 2015 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2013 01 June 2014 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2013 01 June 2014 1 days late
Annual return 31 July 2012 30 May 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 30 May 2013 On Time