Financial history CHILDER THORNTON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1095975
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2011 31/07/2012 31/07/2013 31/07/2014 31/07/2015
Total gross income £51.80k £59.41k £57.11k £60 £1
Total expenditure £43.10k £56.55k £65.86k £10.18k £14.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A