Accounts and annual returns FAS AWARE UK LIMITED

Charity number: 1102118
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 15 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 21 May 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 31 May 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 31 May 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 29 May 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required