Financial history FAS AWARE UK LIMITED

Charity number: 1102118
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £3.00k £9.91k £7.18k £1.39k £4.22k
Total expenditure £5.14k £6.77k £10.65k £2.83k £7.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A