Accounts and annual returns THE DORE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1096562
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 February 2018 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 27 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required