Accounts and annual returns SHEFFIELD PARTNERSHIP ADVICE AND INFORMATION NETWORK

Charity Number: 1096754
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 27 May 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 21 May 2010 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 12 January 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 24 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 31 December 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 28 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 30 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 15 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 24 August 2006 On Time