Accounts and annual returns THE DANDE CHILD PROJECT

Charity number: 1099320
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2015 19 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2014 19 July 2015 164 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2014 Not Required