Financial history THE DANDE CHILD PROJECT

Charity number: 1099320
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2011 05/04/2012 05/04/2013 05/04/2014 05/04/2015
Total gross income £2.80k £2.31k £2.20k £3.24k £4.44k
Total expenditure £2.82k £0 £4.47k £0 £4.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A