Accounts and annual returns THE LEO CUBS (LINKING EARLY OPPORTUNITIES) LIMITED

Charity Number: 1101677
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 15 April 2012 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 15 April 2012 75 days late