Financial history THE LEO CUBS (LINKING EARLY OPPORTUNITIES) LIMITED

Charity Number: 1101677
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2007 30/06/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £343.79k £249.48k £222.25k £350.49k £117.47k
Total expenditure £289.06k £326.38k £248.88k £355.40k £117.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A