Accounts and annual returns Friends of Severndale

Charity number: 1096455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required