Financial history Friends of Severndale

Charity number: 1096455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.43k £1.10k £17.27k £21.83k £16.35k
Total expenditure £7.71k £13.31k £6.41k £17.19k £7.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A