Accounts and annual returns NORTHFIELDS EDUCATION TRUST

Charity Number: 1099067
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2020 13 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 05 July 2020 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 11 July 2019 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required