Financial history NORTHFIELDS EDUCATION TRUST

Charity Number: 1099067
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £64.22k £243.16k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £109.34k £497.58k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A